Financial history THE ROBERTSON BURSARY TRUST

Charity number: 1096708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £35.39k £33.33k £35.34k £32.15k £35.13k
Total expenditure £42.06k £45.35k £47.74k £37.43k £31.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A