Accounts and annual returns LICHFIELD AND TAMWORTH GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1096512
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 August 2019 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required