Financial history CITIZENS ADVICE COLCHESTER

Charity Number: 1097252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £258.72k £299.75k £294.70k £389.21k £467.39k
Total expenditure £240.51k £209.23k £303.68k £307.65k £387.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £53.58k
Income from government grants £179.38k £297.05k £285.00k £386.56k £30.83k