Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE COLCHESTER
Charity Number: 1097252

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jarvis | Chair | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Clare Tippett | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Lanston Don Ramsay | Trustee | 09 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Roberts | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Michael Alasdair Kerr | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Ede | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.