Financial history FAIRFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1096272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.41k £25.52k £42.26k £44.00k £49.35k
Total expenditure £39.61k £26.26k £35.74k £40.71k £43.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.60k N/A N/A N/A