THE FRIENDS OF BUDDENS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist in provision of facilities at Buddens Camping and Activity Centre, so as to further the development and education of young people, to help them to achieve their physical, mental and spiritual development, and improve their condition of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 09 May 2003: Standard registration
- 05 December 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 05 December 2018: Funds transferred to 301214 DORSET COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.52k | £1.52k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 30 May 2017 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 February 2016 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 29 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT BUDDENS CAMPING AND ACTIVITY CENTRE, SO AS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, TO HELP THEM ACHIEVE THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL, AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BUDDENS CAMPING ACTIVITY CENTRE, BERE REGIS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window