THE GASKELL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research and information on the life and works of Elizabeth Gaskell, and the promotion of her works through talks, conferences, seminars, publications, outings and any other appropriate activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Manchester City
- Australia
- Belgium
- Canada
- China
- France
- Greece
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 16 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Diane Elizabeth Duffy | Chair | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARIAN WILLGOOSE | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PHILIP BURTON | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Binnie Donaldson | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GREENWOOD | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne TUCKER | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINSEY JAYNE PARKINSON | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LIBBY TEMPEST | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CELIA CREW | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE RODNEY MAWLE HEATH | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|||||
MRS PAM GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.94k | £7.60k | £13.10k | £17.97k | £13.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.35k | £6.74k | £8.21k | £9.05k | £14.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1986 AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 1988 AND 5 APRIL 2003 as amended on 22 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN, AND THE APPRECIATION OF, THE LIFE AND WORKS OF ELIZABETH GASKELL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Snowdon Road
Eccles
MANCHESTER
M30 9AS
- Phone:
- 07305 839311
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window