THE GARAGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Garage is a performing arts venue in Norwich, supporting artists, audiences and young people across Norfolk and beyond. We programme professional performance, support artists to make work and deliver dance, drama and music participation activities for all ages. We place an emphasis on talent progression and engaging disadvantaged or vulnerable young people with least access to the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,585,267
Donations and legacies | £35.47k | |
Charitable activities | £1.51m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £14.49k | |
Other | £21.35k |
Total expenditure:
£1,545,725
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.55m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £30,655 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.55m | |
Retained for future use | £39.54k |
People

24 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 August 2003: Standard registration
- 30 October 2018: Funds received from 298418 COMMUNITY MUSIC EAST LIMITED
- THE GARAGE (Working name)
- THE ACADEMY TRUST (NORFOLK) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Launchbury | Chair | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Zubair | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Thrower | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Brain | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayla Fulstow | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Field | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Crompton-Howes | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE WARR | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY GILKS | Trustee | 14 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hamilton | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04m | £857.14k | £1.10m | £1.05m | £1.59m | |
|
Total expenditure | £997.33k | £825.53k | £1.05m | £1.14m | £1.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £31.22k | £223.10k | £178.60k | £20.89k | £30.66k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £51.60k | £30.99k | £24.98k | £49.41k | £35.47k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £984.60k | £819.10k | £1.07m | £1.00m | £1.51m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £14.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.05k | £7.05k | £8.11k | £0 | £21.35k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £989.69k | £817.18k | £1.04m | £1.14m | £1.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £8.63k | £12.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £7.64k | £8.34k | £9.12k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £27.53k | £26.97k | £80.07k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £44.24k | |
|
Other assets | £415.32k | £449.28k | £460.05k | £414.58k | £387.50k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £136.75k | £139.09k | £130.74k | £172.29k | £203.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/08/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/08/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITIES OBJECTS ARE: 3.1.1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PERFORMING ARTS, PRINCIPALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, TRAINING, PRODUCTION AND PRESENTATION OF ALL TYPES OF PERFORMING ARTS; AND 3.1.2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ACTIVITIES CONCERNED WITH CREATIVE AND EXPRESSIVE ARTS AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITY INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE UPKEEP, MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITY’S PREMISES; AND 3.1.3 TO AID THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND TO AID THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF THE SAID CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANY CASE, WHETHER OR NOT IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER PARTIES FROM TIME TO TIME AND MAINLY WITHIN THE EASTERN REGION (“THE OBJECTS)
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GARAGE
14 CHAPEL FIELD NORTH
NORWICH
NR2 1NY
- Phone:
- 01603283382
- Email:
- info@thegarage.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window