Financial history LIVERPOOL FC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1096572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £2.36m £3.72m £6.37m £7.06m £8.16m
Total expenditure £3.26m £3.66m £5.04m £6.63m £7.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £323.00k £387.30k £408.88k £251.35k £341.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £343.89k £1.04m £1.39m £1.14m £1.69m
Income - Other trading activities £438.81k £172.50k £2.24m £2.78m £2.82m
Income - Charitable activities £1.57m £2.51m £2.74m £3.13m £3.55m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £19.76k £95.70k
Income - Other £8.23k £932 £918 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.01m £3.47m £4.04m £5.10m £5.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £254.21k £195.03k £997.31k £1.53m £1.14m
Expenditure - Governance £8.40k £8.40k £9.30k £25.59k £11.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £200.00k £60.00k £60.00k £416.00k £301.23k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0