Financial history THE SIR TOM COWIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1096936
Charity reporting is up to date (109 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £174.84k £103.98k £107.32k £103.57k £97.46k
Total expenditure £219.80k £258.63k £247.62k £137.20k £257.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A