Financial history TEES VALLEY YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity number: 1100160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £288.76k £260.89k £272.28k £155.10k £115.56k
Total expenditure £291.71k £236.57k £269.80k £183.19k £141.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.44k £36.03k N/A N/A N/A