SOCIETY FOR CO-OPERATION IN RUSSIAN AND SOVIET STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reference library, photographic archive and SCRSS archive from 1924, when the society was founded, to present day. Loan library of classic and contemporary Russian fiction and a range of other subjects. Russian language seminars, regular lectures, films and other events. Members' information digest three times a year and events email mailing list of Russian related events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 May 2004: Standard registration
- SCRSS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Roy Matthews | Chair |
|
||||||
Meirian Jump | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jane Ansley | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jeremy Hicks | Trustee | 30 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Rosen | Trustee | 30 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Aylward | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lindey | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diana Elizabeth Turner | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Costello | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Barnard | Trustee | 22 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kate Clark | Trustee | 16 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Gibson | Trustee | 21 May 2005 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jameson | Trustee | 20 May 2000 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Stewart | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF BILL BOWRING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.90k | £21.74k | £23.06k | £25.33k | £23.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.24k | £20.56k | £20.92k | £18.98k | £30.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED AND AMENDED 3 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, LEARNING AND KNOWLEDGE OF, AND TO PROMOTE STUDIES IN THE LANGUAGES, CULTURE, HISTORY AND LIFE OF RUSSIA AND THE OTHER COUNTRIES AND NATIONALITIES FORMERLY CONSTITUTING THE UNION OF SOVIET SOCIALIST REPUBLICS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Society For Co-Operation in Russian
& Soviet Stu
320 Brixton Road
LONDON
SW9 6AB
- Phone:
- 02072742282
- Email:
- ruslibrary@scrss.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window