Financial history FULL HOUSE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1098749
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2012 31/01/2013 31/01/2014 31/01/2015 31/01/2016
Total gross income £93.57k £118.76k £203.63k £206.11k £227.32k
Total expenditure £93.38k £117.31k £197.02k £204.15k £236.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £16.35k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k £1.90k