Financial history BLUE VENTURES CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1098893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.06m £9.82m £29.49m £11.94m £16.52m
Total expenditure £6.15m £6.83m £9.83m £14.58m £14.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.75m £1.71m £1.54m £1.86m £1.63m
Income - Donations and legacies £191.80k £9.76m £29.31m £11.25m £16.50m
Income - Other trading activities £298.49k £0 £11.87k £6.91k £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.52m £800 £94.94k £270.04k £18.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.55k £198 £9.72k £408.14k £0
Income - Other £42.35k £58.72k £67.79k £3.07k £1.01k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.00m £6.65m £9.34m £14.09m £13.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £142.02k £152.20k £417.03k £474.99k £488.00k
Expenditure - Governance £67.63k £57.55k £101.29k £113.04k £232.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.40m £2.76m £4.60m £3.40m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £26.02k £76.89k £23.80k £39.67k