ST ALBANS SIGNAL BOX PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Albans South Signal Box is a working museum bringing railway and signal history to our visitors and educating younger members of our community in the dangers of trespassing on the railway. Regular open days and group visits continued. The opportunity to extend the artifacts on display in the box and its gardens through purchases and loans means there is always something new to see for visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 June 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN TELFORD Ret.FCIPD | Chair |
|
||||||
Adrian Keith Wootton | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Allen | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ERIC LITTLE | Trustee | 14 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN FURSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD NEIL KIRK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN SAMUEL WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR K WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.92k | £15.54k | £21.65k | £24.49k | £18.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.20k | £5.47k | £15.80k | £9.42k | £15.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.91k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/01/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO SECURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, USE AND MAINTENANCE OF THE BUILDING KNOWN AS ST ALBANS SIGNAL BOX AND THE EQUIPMENT CONTAINED THEREIN. TO USE TH SIGNAL BOX AND EQUIPMENT AS A WORKING MUSEUM, EXHIBITING ITEMS AND DEMONSTRATIONS OF RAILWAY SIGNALLING HISTORY AND PRACTICE, AND OTHER GENERAL RAILWAY INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE ST ALBANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Charmouth Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL1 4SN
- Phone:
- 01727836131
- Email:
- info@sigbox.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window