Financial history SEVERNDROOG CASTLE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1127071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £80.51k £91.17k £46.41k £42.07k £137.77k
Total expenditure £114.34k £67.26k £51.03k £65.27k £139.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £33.35k £4.48k £2.06k £4.20k