Trustees NORTHERN LADIES ANNUITY SOCIETY
Charity number: 1097222

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA ELIZABETH EMMERSON | Chair | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Catherne Ann Howe | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jillian Fiona Swales | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Alice Bryant | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|||||||
SUZANNE ELAINE ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
CATHERINE WOOD LIB | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
URSULA ELIZABETH MARTELL MB BS | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
ANNABEL JANE DICKINSON | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
CLAIRE MORGAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DIANA MARY BARKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SARAH WESTCOTT CRONE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.