Financial history BURLEY IN WHARFEDALE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1098871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £44.54k £47.27k £83.90k £48.96k £139.75k
Total expenditure £43.02k £64.90k £37.10k £45.72k £51.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £4.19k £11.80k N/A N/A