Financial history SOUTHWATER AREA COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1105027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.89k £41.63k £50.34k £41.05k £51.28k
Total expenditure £26.68k £33.58k £48.79k £46.69k £49.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.24k £17.64k N/A N/A