Alexandra Community Sports and Leisure Centre Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of indoor bowling facilities and other amateur sports and leisure activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 July 2003: Standard registration
- SCARBOROUGH INDOOR BOWLS CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bronagh Toleman | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HASTINGS | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael William Conkerton | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.78k | £135.23k | £96.24k | £109.98k | £135.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.45k | £131.40k | £113.92k | £140.41k | £147.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £38.91k | N/A | £4.69k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 September 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 September 2022 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 April 2022 | 299 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 April 2022 | 299 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 APRIL 2003 as amended on 17 Jan 2023 as amended on 17 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
To promote community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Scarborough and visitors to the area by the provision of facilities for indoor sports, recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life of the said beneficiaries.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alexandra Community Sports and Leisure Centre
SCARBOROUGH INDOOR BOWLS CENTRE LTD
PEASHOLM ROAD
SCARBOROUGH
YO12 7TT
- Phone:
- 01723353992
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window