Financial history STUDY GUATEMALA

Charity number: 1099834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £14.10k £17.68k £59.39k £11.71k £28.58k
Total expenditure £14.84k £16.09k £59.35k £10.97k £20.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A