Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR RESTORATIVE PRACTICES (IIRP) EUROPE

Charity number: 1106409
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 September 2020 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 30 September 2020 153 days late
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 15 January 2019 On Time