Financial history INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR RESTORATIVE PRACTICES (IIRP) EUROPE

Charity number: 1106409
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £78.23k £67.92k £133.09k £66.15k £71.49k
Total expenditure £154.76k £90.03k £92.66k £114.51k £106.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k