Financial history CHESTER MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1099094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £75.60k £5.07k £84.53k £90.36k £99.92k
Total expenditure £73.50k £8.40k £67.01k £89.76k £92.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A