Financial history CANTERBURY CHRIST CHURCH UNIVERSITY

Charity Number: 1098136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £120.18m £152.27m £185.96m £263.83m £319.16m
Total expenditure £126.64m £141.20m £191.21m £260.42m £311.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £490.00k £142.00k £122.00k £19.07k £46.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £119.66m £152.12m £185.83m £262.56m £316.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £142.00k £122.00k £19.07k £46.00k
Income - Investment £25.00k £11.00k £2.00k £1.25m £2.65m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £126.58m £141.13m £191.14m £260.35m £311.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £61.61k £61.61k £70.30k £70.30k £70.30k
Expenditure - Governance £320.26k £315.92k £402.55k £519.50k £647.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0