Financial history RAMBERT SCHOOL OF BALLET AND CONTEMPORARY DANCE

Charity number: 1098900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.90m £2.68m £3.16m £3.34m £3.46m
Total expenditure £2.54m £2.71m £2.77m £3.33m £3.27m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £494.53k £641.62k £690.91k £1.10m £705.97k
Income - Donations and legacies £384.04k £172.63k £513.63k £333.39k £278.89k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £48.95k £33.89k £45.75k
Income - Charitable activities £2.25m £2.42m £2.58m £2.95m £3.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £172.63k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.55k £3.91k £3.79k £20.10k £73.64k
Income - Other £246.64k £87.98k £11.11k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.50m £2.68m £2.73m £2.94m £3.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.50k £36.50k £37.94k £60.57k £123.81k
Expenditure - Governance £15.06k £16.14k £17.52k £34.34k £84.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £332.00k £0