VEOLIA HAVERING RIVERSIDE MAINTENANCE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide funding to organisations based in the Havering and Essex area that will deliver projects that have a community benefit, to help alleviate poverty, improve social cohesion and improve the health and wellbeing of residents affected by the landfill site in Rainham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Havering
Governance
- 08 January 2004: Standard registration
- 24 April 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1064144 THE VEOLIA ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST
- CHRMMT (Working name)
- THE CLEANAWAY HAVERING RIVERSIDE MAINTENANCE TRUST (Previous name)
- VEOLIA ES CLEANAWAY HAVERING RIVERSIDE MAINTENANCE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.07k | £16.26k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39m | £2.08m | £249.69k | £64.49k | £20.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 April 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM & ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 04/07/2003 AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/05/2007 & 24/08/2010, AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 31/03/2009 & 30/09/2009, NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED 03/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 APR 2019 as amended on 09 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHIN THE MINIMUM PRESCRIBED TIMETABLE THROUGH THE: 3.1 PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY RESTORING OR RECLAIMING LAND WHICH CAN OTHERWISE BE USED FOR ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR ENVIRONMENTAL PURPOSES BY REASON OF POLLUTION DAMAGE CAUSED BY AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND. 3.2 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.2.1 PREVENTING OR REDUCING ANY POTENTIAL CAUSES OF POLLUTION IN RELATION TO ANY LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND; AND 3.2.2 REMEDYING OR MITIGATING THE EFFECTS OF ANY POLLUTION IN RELATION TO LAND WHICH HAS SUFFERED OR MAY SUFFER POLLUTION AS A RESULT OF AN ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND. 3.3 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.3.1 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES; AND 3.3.2 CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH (IN THIS ARTICLE, “SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES” SHALL MEAN WASTE MINIMISATION, MINIMISATION OF POLLUTION AND HARMFUL WASTE, RE-USE OF WASTE, WASTE RECOVERY ACTIVITIES AND CLEARANCE OF POLLUTANTS FROM CONTAMINATED LAND). 3.4 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.4.1 THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND OR OPEN SPACE; OR 3.4.2 THE PROVISION OF SOME OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE PROVIDED THAT ANY PUBLIC PARK, RECREATION GROUND, OPEN SPACE OR PUBLIC AMENITY PROVIDED, MAINTAINED, OR IMPROVED BY VIRTUE OF THIS ARTICLE SHALL NOT BE OPERATED FOR PROFIT. (IN THIS ARTICLE, “LANDFILL SITE” SHALL HAVE THE MEANING ASCRIBED BY SECTION 66 OF THE FINANCE ACT 1996). PROVIDED THAT, AS REQUIRED BY REGULATION 33 OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996, THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN THIS ARTICLE SHALL BE DEEMED NOT TO EXTEND TO THE CARRYING OUT OF WORKS WHICH AT THE TIME THEY ARE CARRIED OUT ARE REQUIRED WHOLLY OR PARTLY TO BE CARRIED OUT BY A NOTICE OR ORDER WITHIN THE MEANING OF REGULATION 33(4) OR A RELEVANT CONDITION AS DEFINED BY REGULATION 33(10), OR (IN THE CASE OF ARTICLES 3.1 AND 3.2) THE ACCRUAL OF ANY BENEFIT TO ANY PERSON WHO HAS CARRIED OUT OR KNOWINGLY PERMITTED THE PREVIOUS USE IN QUESTION, OR (IN THE CASE OF ARTICLE 3.4) THE OPERATION OF ANY SUCH PUBLIC PARKS OR OTHER PUBLIC AMENITIES OR FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH A VIEW TO PROFIT. 3.5 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF A BUILDING OR OTHER STRUCTURE WHICH: 3.5.1 IS A PLACE OF RELIGIOUS WORSHIP OR OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST 3.5.2 IS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, AND 3.5.3 IS SITUATED IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE, PROVIDED THAT PARAGRAPH (6) OF THE REGULATION 33 (2) OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996 (AS AMENDED) IS COMPLIED WITH. 3.6 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE CONSERVATION OR PROMOTION OF BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY BY: 3.6.1 THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION, RESTORATION OR ENHANCEMENT OF A NATURAL HABITAT IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE, OR 3.6.2 THE MAINTENANCE OR RECOVERY OF A SPECIES IN ITS NATURAL HABITAT, ON LAND OR IN WATER IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE, PROVIDED THAT PARAGRAPH (3A) OF THE REGULATION 33 (2) OF THE LANDFILL TAX REGULATIONS 1996 (AS AMENDED) IS COMPILED WITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HAVERING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window