Financial history YAD VASHEM UK FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1099659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £391.25k £472.70k £444.20k £579.49k £399.01k
Total expenditure £235.40k £398.47k £570.95k £644.44k £351.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.00k £35.44k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £526.33k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £26.37k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.26k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £25.53k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £618.03k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £26.41k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £34.83k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £8.00k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A