Financial history YMCA NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE LTD.

Charity Number: 1100749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.39m £4.85m £5.10m £5.34m £5.23m
Total expenditure £5.33m £4.39m £4.68m £4.98m £4.92m
Income from government contracts £805.89k £681.14k £850.31k £930.42k £587.03k
Income from government grants N/A £357.81k £240.02k £80.01k £34.03k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.02k £210.36k £9.93k £19.51k £7.44k
Income - Other trading activities £68.69k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.31m £4.38m £5.07m £5.30m £5.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.69k £1.43k £3.97k £18.74k £55.78k
Income - Other £0 £262.42k £18.84k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.33m £4.39m £4.68m £4.98m £4.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.70k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0