YMCA NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE LTD.

Charity number: 1100749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The YMCA has a holistic range of services which can embrace all of the diverse aspects of our community. Housing and Support Training and Employment Volunteering Sports, Health, Fitness and Activity Youth Services Affordable Food Provision Community Facilities Family Relationships

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 November 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • STOKE ON TRENT & NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE YMCA FOYER (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GLENN HANDFORTH Chair
None on record
Mahishmi Irvine Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
HIFSA HAROON-IQBAL Trustee 16 February 2023
None on record
Trevor Lloyd Gordon Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Jayne Thorpe Trustee 23 November 2020
None on record
Nathan Cy Joy - Johnson Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
Jane Sawyers QPM DL Trustee 25 March 2019
None on record
Dr Steve Wyn Williams Trustee 27 November 2017
None on record
Paul Williams Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
PETER ANDREW DARTFORD Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
Paul John Franklin Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
Andrew Robinson Trustee 17 September 2012
None on record
BARBARA SUMNER Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL JONATHON TOOHEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.39m £4.85m £5.10m £5.34m £5.23m
Total expenditure £5.33m £4.39m £4.68m £4.98m £4.92m
Income from government contracts £805.89k £681.14k £850.31k £930.42k £587.03k
Income from government grants N/A £357.81k £240.02k £80.01k £34.03k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.02k £210.36k £9.93k £19.51k £7.44k
Income - Other trading activities £68.69k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.31m £4.38m £5.07m £5.30m £5.16m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.69k £1.43k £3.97k £18.74k £55.78k
Income - Other £0 £262.42k £18.84k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.33m £4.39m £4.68m £4.98m £4.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.70k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £13.66m £14.24m £14.42m £14.00m £14.91m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.85m £3.07m £3.29m £3.62m £3.73m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£103.34k -£82.73k -£120.60k -£96.88k -£40.85k
Total liabilities £13.51m £13.87m £13.81m £13.53m £14.30m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
YMCA
EDINBURGH HOUSE
HARDING ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 3AE
Phone:
01782 222376