Trustees YMCA NORTH STAFFORDSHIRE LTD.
Charity Number: 1100749

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLENN HANDFORTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mahishmi Irvine | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
HIFSA HAROON-IQBAL | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Lloyd Gordon | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Thorpe | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Cy Joy - Johnson | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Sawyers QPM DL | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steve Wyn Williams | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Williams | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER ANDREW DARTFORD | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Franklin | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robinson | Trustee | 17 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA SUMNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JONATHON TOOHEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.