KIDDERMINSTER AND WORCESTERSHIRE PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At the Annual Meeting of the above named Group held on the 20th January 2015. It was proposed and seconded and unanimously agreed that the new title of the Group would be Kidderminster and Worcestershire Prostate Cancer Support Group. Is this change within the framework of our Group? Or do we have to have the change agreed by you? Revd Canon Paul Brothwell. Chairman
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 November 2003: Standard registration
- PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP (KIDDERMINSTER + DISTRICT) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY SYMONS RGN BSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL COOK | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA LANGFORD | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALISON HANSON | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Nigel Corbishley | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Derek Scully | Trustee | 12 January 2018 |
|
|||||
PAUL MARKALL | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR RICHARD HERBERT MB CH.B | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.78k | £12.71k | £13.07k | £20.10k | £26.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.80k | £7.94k | £14.59k | £17.33k | £32.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 21 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED 20 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 20/01/2015 AS AMENDED ON 19 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OR POVERTY OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER 2. TO HELP AND SUPPORT PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM, THE PARTNERS, FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF PERSONS WITH PROSTATE CANCER AND PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER 3. TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND INFORMATION ABOUT PROSTATE CANCER TO PERSONS VULNERABLE TO AND WITH PROSTATE CANCER, PERSONS BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, AND TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF PROSTATE CANCER.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Swiss Heights
STOURPORT-ON-SEVERN
Worcestershire
DY13 0LJ
- Phone:
- 01299823166
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window