Financial history THE ELY COMMUNITY UNIT TRUST

Charity number: 1101031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £30.14k £30.04k £30.02k £30.49k £30.42k
Total expenditure £25.40k £22.81k £28.39k £24.96k £30.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A