THE MISS J K STIRRUP CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 2003: Standard registration
- THE MISS JOYCE KATHLEEN STIRRUP CHARITY TRUST (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/08/2019 | 18/08/2020 | 18/08/2021 | 18/08/2022 | 18/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.79k | £58.43k | £52.36k | £69.01k | £78.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.22k | £83.64k | £93.11k | £95.49k | £208.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 18 August 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 August 2019 | 13 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window