Financial history PENINIM CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 1099593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £374.07k £188.61k £177.64k £193.30k £214.94k
Total expenditure £246.12k £275.39k £170.06k £211.12k £261.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A