Financial history SOUTH DORSET COMMUNITY SPORTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1101711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £519.30k £288.38k £473.88k £506.72k £552.20k
Total expenditure £513.33k £334.67k £434.64k £498.06k £503.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £118.60k £49.46k £46.88k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £41.90k N/A N/A £3.48k £3.92k
Income - Other trading activities £477.39k N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A £503.24k £546.58k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £8 N/A N/A £0 £1.70k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £513.33k N/A N/A £498.06k £503.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £1.68k £1.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0