Financial history HOLLINGDEAN DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1102541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.55k £49.45k £40.77k £44.71k £52.67k
Total expenditure £26.38k £45.10k £38.61k £62.56k £49.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.75k £8.00k £22.72k £10.00k