Financial history GTFM (SOUTH WALES) LTD

Charity number: 1111030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.38k £50.32k £47.15k £36.70k £60.29k
Total expenditure £40.53k £49.48k £47.83k £36.62k £48.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.73k
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k £4.00k N/A N/A