HARRISON HOUSING

Charity number: 1101143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of the aged poor by provision of housing and associated amenities and housing management services provided to other almshouse charities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden
  • City Of Westminster
  • Essex
  • Hackney
  • Hammersmith And Fulham
  • Hounslow
  • Kensington And Chelsea
  • Lambeth
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN MORRISON Chair 16 October 2018
None on record
Phil Green Trustee 26 February 2025
None on record
Stephanie McHugh Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Paul McLoughlin Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Elizabeth McGinn Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Faramarz Jalalpour Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Julia Nammuni Trustee 20 September 2021
None on record
Paul Lautman Trustee 16 October 2018
None on record
Robert Hicks Trustee 29 March 2018
None on record
Sue Hockett Trustee 26 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.34m £1.35m £1.39m £1.31m £1.53m
Total expenditure £1.41m £1.28m £1.69m £1.58m £1.93m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.57k £847 £807 £1.78k £2.43k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.21m £1.25m £1.31m £1.38m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £177.08k £139.97k £140.81k £141.92k £144.01k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.38m £1.25m £1.65m £1.55m £1.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.51k £35.11k £37.67k £37.07k £35.53k
Expenditure - Governance £37.17k £0 £19.94k £0 £24.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £30.51k £35.11k £37.67k £0 £35.53k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £8.03m £7.86m £7.71m £7.53m £7.40m
Long-term investments £5.79m £5.91m £6.38m £5.58m £5.61m
Other assets £473.16k £601.87k £549.16k £510.57k £660.81k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£70.00k -£76.92k -£11.00k -£87.04k -£71.02k
Total liabilities £157.43k £142.94k £223.02k £246.04k £363.34k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 April 2024 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 April 2024 155 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 22 MAR 1968 AS AMENDED ON 07 FEB 1980 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 14 JAN 1993 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 27 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE ALMSPEOPLE SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO PROFESS THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID WHO ARE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 60 AND 75 YEARS
Area of benefit
BRENT, CAMDEN, KENSINGTON & CHELSEA & CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
HARRISON HOUSING
42-46 ST. JAMES'S GARDENS
LONDON
W11 4RQ
Phone:
02076034332