QUAGGY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion for the public benefit of urban regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation and, in particular,the area of benefit Delivery of Early education and childcare and Children Centres Other activities for the enhancement and benefit of the local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,863,284
Donations and legacies | £87.67k | |
Charitable activities | £2.68m | |
Other trading activities | £1.21k | |
Investments | £87.44k | |
Other | £7.07k |
Total expenditure:
£2,328,721
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,806,612 from 4 government contract(s) and £751 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.33m | |
Retained for future use | £534.56k |
People

52 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- 26 May 2005: Standard registration
- QUAGGY CHILDRENS CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Meguerditchian | Chair | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Qureshi | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice-Mihaela Panduru | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI FRANCES DELAP | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON RILEY | Trustee | 20 April 2010 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33m | £3.27m | £3.11m | £2.25m | £2.86m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10m | £3.07m | £2.91m | £2.00m | £2.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.16m | £2.24m | £1.31m | £1.81m | |
|
Income from government grants | £898.04k | £13.96k | £25.00k | £19.48k | £751 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £47.79k | £47.10k | £53.00k | £83.29k | £87.67k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £55.33k | £24.97k | £28.85k | £57.34k | £1.21k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.16m | £3.17m | £2.99m | £2.05m | £2.68m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £16.55k | £21.66k | £35.48k | £54.55k | £87.44k | |
|
Income - Other | £3.07k | £2.05k | £4.85k | £5.11k | £7.07k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.03m | £3.03m | £2.87m | £1.91m | £2.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £65.35k | £39.10k | £41.45k | £88.41k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.50k | £51.78k | £21.37k | £13.52k | £10.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £279.43k | £256.61k | £213.61k | £178.75k | £173.76k | |
|
Long-term investments | £475.00k | £966.04k | £973.14k | £1.76m | £1.82m | |
|
Other assets | £2.24m | £1.58m | £1.73m | £1.17m | £1.74m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£63.55k | -£191.08k | -£177.07k | -£7.28k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £798.38k | £383.35k | £310.32k | £264.16k | £287.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MARCH 2005. as amended on 01 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
1.1 The Charity’s objects (“the Objects”) are the promotion for the public benefit of urban regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation (and in particular the area of benefit) by all or any of the following means: 1.1.1 The development of the capacity and skills of the members of the area of benefit in such a way that they are better able to identify and help meet their needs, and to participate more fully in society. 1.1.2 The relief of poverty in such ways as may be thought fit. 1.1.3 The relief of unemployment in such ways as may be thought fit. 1.1.4 The advancement of education, training or retraining, particularly among unemployed people, and providing employed people with work experience. 1.1.5 The provision of recreational facilities for the public at large and/or those who by reasons of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, poverty or social and economic circumstances have need of such facilities. 1.1.6 The provision of public health facilities and childcare. 1.1.7 The provision of public safety and prevention of crime. 1.1.8 Such other means as may from time to time be determined, subject to the prior consent of the Charity Commissioners for England and Wales. The area of benefit is the West Ward of the Royal Borough of Greenwich, and the immediate surrounding area.
Area of benefit
COLDBATH AND ORCHARD ESTATES IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH AND THE IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUAGGY CHILDRENS CENTRE
ORCHARD HILL
LONDON
SE13 7QZ
- Phone:
- 02084659785
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window