Financial history ONLINE TRANSPORT ARCHIVE

Charity number: 1101785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.20k £23.30k £21.92k £650.51k £35.72k
Total expenditure £16.73k £22.81k £23.24k £27.82k £31.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £641.49k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £7.45k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.57k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £630.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £27.82k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £720 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A