Financial history GREAT HALL PLAYERS

Charity number: 1103428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £21.54k £2.84k £4.28k £569 £2.09k
Total expenditure £20.88k £1.66k £6.53k £532 £338
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A