DRESSABILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support independence and wellbeing, Dressability provides a specialist garment adaptation/alteration service - based on the sensitive and informed identification of discrete solutions to the complex clothing challenges encountered by people with disabilities, learning difficulties and/or mobility impairments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 13 February 2004: Standard registration
- 08 September 2021: Funds received from 1121631 THE AUTUMN TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Crawford | Chair | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Probert-Thompson | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
BERYL FITZGERALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.91k | £97.27k | £151.73k | £160.42k | £181.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.07k | £78.26k | £100.61k | £122.63k | £136.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A SPECIALIST CLOTHING SERVICE AND THROUGH THE DESIGN AND ADAPTATION OF CLOTHING FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, BUT IN PRACTICE SWINDON AND WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DRESSABILITY
BRADBURY HOUSE
WESTMEAD DRIVE
SWINDON
SN5 7ER
- Phone:
- 01793512878
- Email:
- mail@dressability.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window