Financial history BENTON DENE SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.58k £7.05k £4.85k £1.74k £4.16k
Total expenditure £9.06k £25.49k £2.44k £1.80k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A