Financial history Birmingham Newman University

Charity number: 1110346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £23.79m £24.12m £24.37m £25.20m £34.15m
Total expenditure £23.37m £22.09m £23.95m £25.01m £32.00m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.03m £1.13m £1.30m £1.21m £930.24k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £240
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £23.76m £24.12m £24.36m £25.02m £33.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26.70k £5.03k £6.82k £181.64k £495.43k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.37m £22.09m £23.95m £25.01m £32.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £43.62k £17.73k £48.66k £69.02k £76.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0