Financial history Citizens Advice Bury and Bolton Limited

Charity number: 1102536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.97m £2.02m £1.62m £1.62m £1.92m
Total expenditure £1.93m £1.79m £1.48m £1.81m £1.97m
Income from government contracts N/A £160.00k £140.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £998.00k £589.00k £122.34k £442.20k £304.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £115.50k £269 £105 £0 £10.00k
Income - Other trading activities £8.34k £0 £0 £78.90k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.82m £1.98m £1.62m £1.54m £1.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £713 £138 £62 £1.89k £6.76k
Income - Other £28.70k £100.56k £0 £0 £15.30k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.93m £1.79m £1.48m £1.81m £1.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.50k £2.66k £5.43k £5.90k £5.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0