Financial history SEWERBY WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1102199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £2.56k £490 £1.08k £2.36k £2.17k
Total expenditure £2.02k £313 £1.07k £1.59k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A