TAUNTON EAST DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a venue which is manned by one paid staff and volunteers for various 'surgeries', Housing Benefits, Housing Advice for tenants, Fresh steps NHS,Job Club. Drop in help and advice and sign posting Organizes various activities in the community, every school holiday activities days, Brunch Clubs Prepares a regular Community Newsletter/manages a website
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £19,088 from 1 government contract(s) and £32,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 01 June 2004: Standard registration
- TEDT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yang Li | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Lee Kassapian | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Wray | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY GREENSLADE | Trustee | 01 June 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.94k | £79.37k | £178.11k | £217.81k | £195.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.67k | £58.97k | £91.52k | £179.65k | £231.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.81k | N/A | £35.99k | £24.06k | £19.09k | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.22k | £33.95k | £23.00k | £27.50k | £32.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 MAY 2004. as amended on 08 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
The promotion for the benefit of the public of community regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation in particular but not exclusively in Taunton East by all or any of the following means: (a) the relief of financial hardship among people (including but not limited to individuals and families) by providing such persons with goods, services, advice and support for the improvement of the conditions of life in socially and economically disadvantaged communities to enable them to thrive and encourage the development of a cohesive, connected and supportive community; (b) developing the skills of the members of socially and economically disadvantaged communities in such a way that they are better able to identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society; (c) the maintenance, improvement or provision of public amenities; (d) the provision of facilities, events and / or activities designed to support the promotion of community capacity building and cohesion; (e) the protection or conservation of the environment; and (f) such other means as may from time to time be determined subject to the prior written consent of the Charity Commissioners for England and Wales.
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY OF TAUNTON EAST (THE LANE, LAMBROOK AND HALCON ESTATES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Link Centre
12 Moorland Close
TAUNTON
TA1 2DD
- Phone:
- 01823350788
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window