Financial history FACING HISTORY AND OURSELVES

Charity number: 1103592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £572.50k £473.08k £356.08k £558.22k £379.22k
Total expenditure £451.61k £333.51k £344.14k £415.33k £475.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.94k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £548.54k N/A N/A £540.69k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £23.96k N/A N/A £14.75k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £2.78k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £451.61k N/A N/A £391.76k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £23.57k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £24.57k N/A N/A £8.92k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A