Financial history RICHMOND MENCAP LIMITED

Charity number: 1102587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £202.87k £153.08k £157.38k £162.90k £194.33k
Total expenditure £182.69k £150.40k £171.74k £191.83k £200.02k
Income from government contracts £53.80k £63.08k N/A £60.22k £51.25k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £20.00k N/A £7.64k